NJ S2898 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.309.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.309.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Fire and EMS Crisis Intervention Services" telephone hotline; provides funding for hotline through fire inspection fees and penalties.
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Fire and EMS Crisis Intervention Services" telephone hotline; provides funding for hotline through fire inspection fees and penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4357 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.309. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4357 |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4357 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2898