NJ S2852 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1316
Note: Carry Over of previous S1606
Note: Carry Over of previous S1606
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns eligibility for unemployment benefits.
Title
Concerns eligibility for unemployment benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2772 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A1316 (Carry Over) 2022-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S1606 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A1316 (Carry Over) 2022-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S1606 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2852 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2852_I1.HTM |