NJ S2852 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-10 - Approved P.L.2020, c.122.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns eligibility of education employees for unemployment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns eligibility of education employees for unemployment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4613 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-10AssemblyApproved P.L.2020, c.122.
2020-10-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-3)
2020-10-29AssemblySubstituted for A4613
2020-10-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-09-24AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2020-09-24SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2020-09-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-09-14SenateTransferred to Senate Education Committee
2020-08-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4613 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S2852

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback