NJ S2572 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1222
Note: Carry Foward to future S3354
Note: Carry Over of previous A5396
Note: Carry Foward to future S3354
Note: Carry Over of previous A5396
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOT to consult Department of Agriculture and County Agriculture Development Boards when developing transportation capital project list.
Title
Requires DOT to consult Department of Agriculture and County Agriculture Development Boards when developing transportation capital project list.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Durr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2572 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S2572 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A2297 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5396 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5031 (Same As) 2023-01-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2572 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A2297 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5396 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5031 (Same As) 2023-01-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2572 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S3000/2572_I1.HTM |