NJ S2555 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S748
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.411.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.411.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows dependent students whose parents or guardians hold H-1B visas to qualify for in-State tuition at public institutions of higher education provided they meet certain criteria. *
Title
Allows dependent students whose parents or guardians hold H-1B visas to qualify for in-State tuition at public institutions of higher education provided they meet certain criteria. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3990 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.411. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (60-12-2) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A3990 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-4) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2555 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.411.
A3990 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2555 (1R)
A3990 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2555 (1R)