NJ A3990 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S748
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2555 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2555 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows dependent students whose parents or guardians hold H-1B visas to qualify for in-State tuition at public institutions of higher education provided they meet certain criteria.*
Title
Allows dependent students whose parents or guardians hold H-1B visas to qualify for in-State tuition at public institutions of higher education provided they meet certain criteria.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S2555 (1R) |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3990 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2555 (1R)
S2555 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.411.
S2555 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.411.