NJ S2404 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4006
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4006
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Postpones New Jersey Quality Single Accountability Continuum (NJQSAC) review for certain school districts to accommodate disruption due to COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Postpones New Jersey Quality Single Accountability Continuum (NJQSAC) review for certain school districts to accommodate disruption due to COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A4006 |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4006 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly