NJ A4006 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Postpones New Jersey Quality Single Accountability Continuum (NJQSAC) review for certain school districts to accommodate disruption due to COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Postpones New Jersey Quality Single Accountability Continuum (NJQSAC) review for certain school districts to accommodate disruption due to COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] |
Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted for S2404 |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2404 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A4006
S3187 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4975 (3R)
S3187 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4975 (3R)