NJ S3187 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4975 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A4975 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides Postpones of New Jersey Quality Single Accountability Continuum review for certain school districts.
Title
Provides Postpones of New Jersey Quality Single Accountability Continuum review for certain school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A4975 (3R) |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4006 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A4975 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.143.
A4975 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - Approved P.L.2020, c.143.