NJ S2368 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2534
Note: Carry Over of previous S3321
Note: Carry Over of previous A4890
Note: Carry Over of previous S3321
Note: Carry Over of previous A4890
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain exclusions and credits under gross income and corporation business taxes for contributions to lifelong learning accounts.
Title
Establishes certain exclusions and credits under gross income and corporation business taxes for contributions to lifelong learning accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2368 (Carry Over) 2020-04-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2620 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S3321 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4890 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A2620 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S3321 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4890 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2368 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2368_I1.HTM |