NJ S2332 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "2020 New Jersey Emergency Rental Assistance Program"; appropriates $100 million.
Title
Establishes "2020 New Jersey Emergency Rental Assistance Program"; appropriates $100 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3956 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3956 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-0-14) |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Substituted for A3956 (1R) |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A3956 (Same As) 2020-05-14 - Substituted by S2332 (1R)