NJ S2244 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2135
Note: Carry Over of previous A5960
Note: Carry Over of previous S3986
Note: Carry Over of previous A5960
Note: Carry Over of previous S3986
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes $2.5 million in federal funds available to EDA to support veteran-owned businesses in need.
Title
Makes $2.5 million in federal funds available to EDA to support veteran-owned businesses in need.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2244 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1591 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A5960 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3986 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1591 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A5960 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3986 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2244 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2500/2244_I1.HTM |