NJ S2181 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S696
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Vetoed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (25-14) (Gordon)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (25-14) (Gordon)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases transparency and accountability at PANYNJ.
Title
Increases transparency and accountability at PANYNJ.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Veto Override (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Veto Override (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3417 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3417 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Veto Override (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3417 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3417 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Lost in the Senate AVOR (25-14) (Gordon) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A3417 |
2014-10-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2014-09-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2181 (Carry Over) 2015-03-16 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (25-14) (Gordon)
A3417 (Same As) 2014-11-13 - Substituted by S2181
A3417 (Same As) 2014-11-13 - Substituted by S2181