NJ A3417 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-13 - Substituted by S2181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases transparency and accountability at PANYNJ.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases transparency and accountability at PANYNJ.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-11-13AssemblySubstituted by S2181
2014-10-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-10-23AssemblyTransferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2014-06-16AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2181 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (25-14) (Gordon)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback