NJ S1937 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4005
Note: Carry Over of previous A5304
Note: Carry Over of previous A5304
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Task Force to Promote Employment by State Agencies of People with Disabilities.
Title
Establishes Task Force to Promote Employment by State Agencies of People with Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1597 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1597 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.84. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A1597 (1R) |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Madden) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1597 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S1937 (1R)
S4005 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A5304 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S4005 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A5304 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee