NJ S1893 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipality, county or school district to establish charitable funds for specific purposes; permits property tax credit for certain donations.
Title
Authorizes municipality, county or school district to establish charitable funds for specific purposes; permits property tax credit for certain donations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3499 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.11. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-12) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-3) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (49-23-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Handlin) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A3499 (1R) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-9) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Motion To Table SS (25-13) (Weinberg) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Motion To SS (Pennacchio) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3499 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S1893 (1R)