NJ S1884 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1327
Note: Carry Foward to future A2811
Note: Carry Over of previous S656
Note: Carry Over of previous A2168
Note: Carry Foward to future A2811
Note: Carry Over of previous S656
Note: Carry Over of previous A2168
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits patients to indicate that they should not be prescribed opiates and certain other controlled substances in prescription monitoring program information.
Title
Permits patients to indicate that they should not be prescribed opiates and certain other controlled substances in prescription monitoring program information.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1884 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1884 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A264 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S656 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2168 (Carry Over) 2018-01-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1884 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A264 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S656 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2168 (Carry Over) 2018-01-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1884 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1884_I1.HTM |