NJ S1778 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (22-13 (Greenstein)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (22-13 (Greenstein)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Thomas P. Canzanella Twenty First Century First Responders Protection Act"; concerns workers' compensation for public safety workers.
Title
"Thomas P. Canzanella Twenty First Century First Responders Protection Act"; concerns workers' compensation for public safety workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Senate - Senate Veto Override (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1196 Aaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1196 Aaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Senate | Lost in the Senate AVOR (22-13 (Greenstein) |
2013-07-29 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-19-5) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A1196 (2R) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-13) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1196 (Same As) 2013-05-20 - Substituted by S1778 (1R)