NJ S1540 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3110
Note: Carry Over of previous S3938
Note: Carry Over of previous A5847
Note: Carry Over of previous S3938
Note: Carry Over of previous A5847
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes local units to refinance general obligation bonds irrespective of present value savings for period of one year.
Title
Authorizes local units to refinance general obligation bonds irrespective of present value savings for period of one year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1540 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A643 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3938 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5847 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A643 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3938 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5847 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1540 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2000/1540_I1.HTM |