NJ A643 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3110
Note: Carry Over of previous A5847
Note: Carry Over of previous S3938
Note: Carry Over of previous A613
Note: Carry Over of previous S2437
Note: Carry Over of previous A5847
Note: Carry Over of previous S3938
Note: Carry Over of previous A613
Note: Carry Over of previous S2437
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes local units to refinance general obligation bonds irrespective of present value savings for period of one year.
Title
Authorizes local units to refinance general obligation bonds irrespective of present value savings for period of one year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A643 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5847 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3938 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1540 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A613 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S2437 (Carry Over) 2020-06-26 - Approved P.L.2020, c.42.
A5847 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3938 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1540 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A613 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S2437 (Carry Over) 2020-06-26 - Approved P.L.2020, c.42.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A643 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1000/643_I1.HTM |