NJ S2437 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A643
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Approved P.L.2020, c.42.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Approved P.L.2020, c.42.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limits service fees charged to restaurants by third-party food takeout and delivery applications during COVID-19 state of emergency.
Title
Limits service fees charged to restaurants by third-party food takeout and delivery applications during COVID-19 state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3978 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.42. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-1-2) |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Substituted for A3978 (1R) |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2437 (Carry Over) 2020-06-26 - Approved P.L.2020, c.42.
A3978 (Same As) 2020-06-18 - Substituted by S2437 (1R)
A3978 (Same As) 2020-06-18 - Substituted by S2437 (1R)