NJ S1449 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1957
Note: Carry Foward to future S907
Note: Carry Over of previous A4903
Note: Carry Over of previous S3357
Note: Carry Foward to future S907
Note: Carry Over of previous A4903
Note: Carry Over of previous S3357
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "Liberty State Park Protection Act"; establishes Liberty State Park Advisory Committee and requirements concerning DEP actions related to Liberty State Park.
Title
The "Liberty State Park Protection Act"; establishes Liberty State Park Advisory Committee and requirements concerning DEP actions related to Liberty State Park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported without Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading without recommendation |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1449 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1449 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2189 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A4903 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S3357 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S1449 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2189 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A4903 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S3357 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading