NJ S3357 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1449
Note: Carry Foward to future A2189
Note: Carry Foward to future A2189
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The "Liberty State Park Protection Act"; establishes Liberty State Park Advisory Committee and requirements concerning DEP actions related to Liberty State Park.
Title
The "Liberty State Park Protection Act"; establishes Liberty State Park Advisory Committee and requirements concerning DEP actions related to Liberty State Park.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-13) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3357 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3357 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4903 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S3357 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4903 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)