NJ A2189 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1957
Note: Carry Foward to future S907
Note: Carry Over of previous A4903
Note: Carry Over of previous S3357
Note: Carry Foward to future S907
Note: Carry Over of previous A4903
Note: Carry Over of previous S3357
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "Liberty State Park Protection Act"; establishes Liberty State Park Advisory Committee and requirements concerning DEP actions related to Liberty State Park.
Title
The "Liberty State Park Protection Act"; establishes Liberty State Park Advisory Committee and requirements concerning DEP actions related to Liberty State Park.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2189 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A2189 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A4903 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S1449 (Same As) 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3357 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A2189 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
A4903 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S1449 (Same As) 2021-12-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3357 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2189 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2189_I1.HTM |