NJ S1447 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2772
Note: Carry Over of previous A5243
Note: Carry Over of previous A5243
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Substituted by A3424 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Substituted by A3424 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Annual Business Matchmaking Event" in Department of Treasury.
Title
Establishes "Annual Business Matchmaking Event" in Department of Treasury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A3424 (1R) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2022-11-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Sarlo) |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Beach) |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2772 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A5243 (Carry Over) 2021-01-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3424 (Same As) 2023-10-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.165.
A5243 (Carry Over) 2021-01-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3424 (Same As) 2023-10-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.165.