NJ S1423 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S334
Note: Carry Foward to future A1745
Note: Carry Over of previous S4062
Note: Carry Over of previous A5743
Note: Carry Foward to future A1745
Note: Carry Over of previous S4062
Note: Carry Over of previous A5743
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires carriers to pass prescription drug savings to consumers.
Title
Requires carriers to pass prescription drug savings to consumers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1423 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1423 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2222 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S4062 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5743 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1423 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2222 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S4062 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5743 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee