NJ S1032 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1309
Note: Carry Foward to future S809
Note: Carry Over of previous A101
Note: Carry Over of previous S2668
Note: Carry Over of previous A508
Note: Carry Foward to future S809
Note: Carry Over of previous A101
Note: Carry Over of previous S2668
Note: Carry Over of previous A508
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tax credits to companies contributing to loan and loan redemption program for residents who attend institutions of higher education in State and work at such company upon graduation.
Title
Provides tax credits to companies contributing to loan and loan redemption program for residents who attend institutions of higher education in State and work at such company upon graduation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1032 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S1032 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1121 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A101 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2668 (Carry Over) 2020-07-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A508 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1032 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1121 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A101 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2668 (Carry Over) 2020-07-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A508 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1032 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1500/1032_I1.HTM |