NJ S1016 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1091
Note: Carry Over of previous S2288
Note: Carry Over of previous S2288
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.386.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.386.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts use of neonicotinoid pesticides.
Title
Restricts use of neonicotinoid pesticides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2070 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2070 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.386. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-7) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-21-3) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A2070 (ACS/3R) |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-6) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1016 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.386.
A2070 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S1016 (SCS/4R)
S2288 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2070 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S1016 (SCS/4R)
S2288 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading