NJ A1091 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2070
Note: Carry Over of previous S1016
Note: Carry Over of previous S1016
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts use of neonicotinoid pesticides.
Title
Restricts use of neonicotinoid pesticides.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2070 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S1016 (SCS/4R)
S1016 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.386.
S1016 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.386.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1091 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1500/1091_I1.HTM |