NJ A2070 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1091
Note: Carry Over of previous A4562
Note: Carry Over of previous S2288
Note: Carry Over of previous A4562
Note: Carry Over of previous S2288
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S1016 (SCS/4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S1016 (SCS/4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts use of neonicotinoid pesticides.
Title
Restricts use of neonicotinoid pesticides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S1016 (SCS/4R) |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2070 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S1016 (SCS/4R)
A4562 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1016 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.386.
S2288 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4562 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1016 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.386.
S2288 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading