NJ A850 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2140
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Approved P.L.2021, c.161.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Approved P.L.2021, c.161.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Broadband Access Study Commission."
Title
Establishes "Broadband Access Study Commission."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Amend (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2864 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Amend (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2864 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.161. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-1) |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-2-1) |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Concur by Assembly Amendments (66-0-3) (Chiaravalloti) |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-1) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Substituted for S2864 (2R) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment (28-0) (Oroho) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-3-2) |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2140 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S2864 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Substituted by A850 (3R)
S2864 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Substituted by A850 (3R)