NJ S2864 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2140
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Substituted by A850 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Substituted by A850 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Broadband Access Study Commission."
Title
Establishes "Broadband Access Study Commission."
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Senate | Substituted by A850 (3R) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Oroho) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A850 (Same As) 2021-07-07 - Approved P.L.2021, c.161.
A2140 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A2140 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee