NJ A655 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A803
Note: Carry Over of previous S1244
Note: Carry Over of previous S1244
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Passed on December 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.125.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Passed on December 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.125.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts discharge of student loan debt of certain veterans through the federal Total and Permanent Disability discharge process from taxation under the gross income tax.
Title
Exempts discharge of student loan debt of certain veterans through the federal Total and Permanent Disability discharge process from taxation under the gross income tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3051 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-06 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3051 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-06 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.125. |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Substituted for S3051 |
2022-10-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A803 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1244 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3051 (Same As) 2022-10-17 - Substituted by A655
S1244 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3051 (Same As) 2022-10-17 - Substituted by A655