NJ A6212 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A847
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.492.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.492.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $54.5 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for recreation and conservation purposes to DEP for State capital and park development projects.
Title
Appropriates $54.5 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for recreation and conservation purposes to DEP for State capital and park development projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4148 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4148 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.492. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S4148 |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6212 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.492.
S4148 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6212
S4148 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6212