NJ S4148 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A847
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $54.5 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for recreation and conservation purposes to DEP for State capital and park development projects.
Title
Appropriates $54.5 million from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for recreation and conservation purposes to DEP for State capital and park development projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A6212 |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4148 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6212
A6212 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.492.
A6212 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.492.