NJ A5975 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.328.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.328.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY2022; makes various changes to FY2022 environmental infrastructure funding program.
Title
Amends list of environmental infrastructure projects approved for long-term funding for FY2022; makes various changes to FY2022 environmental infrastructure funding program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4079 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4079 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.328. |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Substituted for S4079 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-02 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4079 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Substituted by A5975