NJ A5758 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.181.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.181.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides funding for experiential housing advocacy programs to provide legal services for low- and moderate-income tenants in need of housing assistance; appropriates $2 million.
Title
Provides funding for experiential housing advocacy programs to provide legal services for low- and moderate-income tenants in need of housing assistance; appropriates $2 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3842 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3842 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-22 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.181. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-5) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S3842 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-5) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3842 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5758 (2R)