NJ A5709 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-4)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.116.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-4)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.116.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $10 million from General Fund to EDA to support Sustain and Serve NJ Program.
Title
Appropriates $10 million from General Fund to EDA to support Sustain and Serve NJ Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3794 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3794 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.116. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted for S3794 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-1) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3794 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A5709