NJ A5495 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3803 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3803 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain paramedics to administer buprenorphine.
Title
Permits certain paramedics to administer buprenorphine.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. John Armato [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S3803 (1R) |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3803 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.153.