NJ A5345 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.130.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.130.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility under New Jersey earned income tax credit program to allow taxpayers who are at least 18 years of age or older to qualify for modified benefit.
Title
Expands eligibility under New Jersey earned income tax credit program to allow taxpayers who are at least 18 years of age or older to qualify for modified benefit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3428 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3428 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.130. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-1) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S3428 |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (48-24-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Wirths) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3428 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5345