NJ S3428 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility under New Jersey earned income tax credit program to allow taxpayers who are at least 18 years of age or older to qualify for modified benefit.
Title
Expands eligibility under New Jersey earned income tax credit program to allow taxpayers who are at least 18 years of age or older to qualify for modified benefit.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted by A5345 |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5345 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.130.