NJ A5323 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Approved P.L.2023, c.96.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Approved P.L.2023, c.96.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises various provisions concerning State tax law.
Title
Revises various provisions concerning State tax law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3737 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3737 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-03 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.96. |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3737 (3R) |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-28 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3737 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A5323 (2R)