NJ S3737 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A5323 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A5323 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises various provisions concerning State tax law.
Title
Revises various provisions concerning State tax law.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A5323 (2R) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5323 (Same As) 2023-07-03 - Approved P.L.2023, c.96.