NJ A5160 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.464.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.464.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum energy and water efficiency standards for certain products sold, offered for sale, or leased in the State.
Title
Establishes minimum energy and water efficiency standards for certain products sold, offered for sale, or leased in the State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3324 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3324 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.464. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-25-0) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-13) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3324 (2R) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Smith) |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-25-2) |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2020-12-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3324 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5160 (3R)