NJ S3324 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5160 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5160 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum energy and water efficiency standards for certain products sold, offered for sale, or leased in the State.
Title
Establishes minimum energy and water efficiency standards for certain products sold, offered for sale, or leased in the State.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted by A5160 (3R) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Smith) |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5160 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.464.