NJ A4640 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-05 - Approved P.L.2021, c.192.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revises laws concerning delegation of parental or caregiver powers and standby guardianship for minor child or ward.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises laws concerning delegation of parental or caregiver powers and standby guardianship for minor child or ward.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2886 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-05SenateApproved P.L.2021, c.192.
2021-06-03SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2021-06-03SenateSubstituted for S2886 (2R)
2021-06-01SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2021-05-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2021-01-25AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-09-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2886 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4640 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback