NJ A4604 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides Medicaid coverage for family planning services to individuals with incomes up to 200 percent of the federal poverty level.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides Medicaid coverage for family planning services to individuals with incomes up to 200 percent of the federal poverty level.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3104 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3104 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-09AssemblyAbsolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
2015-06-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-6)
2015-06-25SenateSubstituted for S3104
2015-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2015-06-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (48-30-0)
2015-06-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2015-06-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1203 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2795

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback