NJ S1203 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1017
Note: Carry Foward to future S3248
Note: Carry Foward to future S3248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2795
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2795
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides Medicaid coverage for family planning services to individuals with incomes up to 200 percent of the federal poverty level.
Title
Provides Medicaid coverage for family planning services to individuals with incomes up to 200 percent of the federal poverty level.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Substituted by A2795 |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1203 (Carry Over) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2795
S1203 (Carry Over) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2795
A2795 (Same As) 2014-09-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A4604 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1203 (Carry Over) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2795
A2795 (Same As) 2014-09-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A4604 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly