NJ A32 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4604
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides Medicaid coverage for family planning services to individuals with incomes up to 200 percent of the federal poverty level.
Title
Provides Medicaid coverage for family planning services to individuals with incomes up to 200 percent of the federal poverty level.
Sponsors
Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1963 (Same As) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S1017
A4604 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A4604 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A32 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/32_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A32 |