NJ A1963 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1656
Note: Carry Over of previous A4604
Note: Carry Over of previous A4604
Note: Carry Over of previous A4604
Note: Carry Over of previous A4604
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S1017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S1017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides Medicaid coverage for family planning services to individuals with incomes up to 200 percent of the federal poverty level.
Title
Provides Medicaid coverage for family planning services to individuals with incomes up to 200 percent of the federal poverty level.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted by S1017 |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1963 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S1017
A4604 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1017 (Same As) 2016-07-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
S3248 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A32 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4604 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A4604 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1017 (Same As) 2016-07-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
S3248 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A32 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4604 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee